House | 03/03/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7024 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Substituted SB 7024 | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Filed |