|
05/11/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-103
|
|
|
|
05/10/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/10/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 79, NAYS 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amendment 388396 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (388396)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Amendment(s) failed (378446, 844640, 941896, 964618) 760
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/22, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 78, NAYS 39
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|