House | 03/08/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 7044 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2022 | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Filed |