House | 03/03/2022 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) | ||
House | 02/27/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Reported out of Redistricting Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | Favorable with CS by Redistricting Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Added to Redistricting Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Now in Redistricting Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Referred to Redistricting Committee | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Filed |