Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill January 19, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 13, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022