02/21/2022 | Chapter No. 2022-2 | |||
02/17/2022 | Approved by Governor | |||
02/10/2022 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Passed; YEAS 99, NAYS 17 | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Immediately certified | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Amendment 362285 Failed | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Substituted for HB 7023 | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 10 NAYS 6 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/12/22, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 12/21/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/21/2021 | Filed |