Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Filed |