Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0160 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022