Florida 2022 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0196 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/25/2022

                    The Florida Senate 
BILL ANALYSIS AND FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT 
(This document is based on the provisions contained in the legislation as of the latest date listed below.) 
Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Appropriations  
 
BILL: SB 196 
INTRODUCER:  Senator Rodriguez 
SUBJECT:  Florida Housing Finance Corporation 
DATE: February 25, 2022 
 
 ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR  REFERENCE  	ACTION 
1. Hackett Ryon CA Favorable 
2. Hrdlicka Hrdlicka ATD  Recommend: Fav/CS 
3. Hrdlicka Sadberry AP Pre-meeting 
 
I. Summary: 
SB 196 designates the Florida Housing Finance Corporation (Florida Housing) as the state fiscal 
agency authorized to make constitutional determinations of fiscal sufficiency in connection with 
their issuance of bonds. Currently, such determinations must be made by the State Board of 
Administration (SBA). To complement this change, the bill also removes a reference to SBA 
rules in the statute governing Florida Housing’s Guarantee Program.   
 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
II. Present Situation: 
The Florida Housing Finance Corporation (Florida Housing) is a public corporation created by 
the Legislature to assist in providing a range of affordable housing opportunities for Florida 
residents. Florida Housing administers federal and state resources to make loans, guarantees of 
loans, and to issue bonds to finance the development and preservation of affordable homeowner 
and rental housing and assist homebuyers with financing and down payment assistance.
1
   
 
Florida Housing Bond Issuance 
Florida Housing facilitates the issuance of bonds by serving in a conduit capacity. Each bond 
indenture is for a single purpose entity and the bonds are secured solely by the revenues, assets, 
                                                
1
 See Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Overview of Florida Housing Finance Corporation, (July 2017) available at 
https://www.floridahousing.org/docs/default-source/aboutflorida/august2017/august2017/tab8.pdf, (last visited 
January 20, 2022). See also part V, ch. 420, F.S. 
REVISED:   BILL: SB 196   	Page 2 
 
and guarantees associated with each bond.
2
 The bonds are not an obligation of the state as they 
are not secured by the full faith and credit of the state.
3
     
 
Section 420.509, F.S., designates the State Board of Administration (SBA) as the state fiscal 
agency to make the determination required by s. 16, Art. VII of the State Constitution, in 
connection with the issuance of Florida Housing bonds. The required fiscal determination is that 
in no state fiscal year will the debt service requirements of the bonds proposed to be issued, and 
all other bonds secured by the same pledged revenues, exceed the pledged revenues available for 
such debt service requirements. This section also authorizes Florida Housing to bear interest on 
the bonds that are issued. However, the rate or rates may not exceed the interest rate limitation 
set forth in s. 215.84(3), F.S.,
4
 unless authorized by the SBA.
5
  
 
Before a bond is issued, Florida Housing’s Board of Directors approves the requirements for a 
bond financed development at a public meeting. Upon the Board’s approval, a fiscal sufficiency 
report is prepared by a third party and submitted to the SBA for approval. The Governor and the 
Florida Cabinet, functioning as the SBA Board of Trustees, must place the report on the agenda 
for the next scheduled SBA Board of Trustees meeting, and only upon approval by the SBA 
Board of Trustees can the bond transaction proceed to closing.
6
 Florida Housing has stated that 
this mechanism can produce significant delays in bond issuance due to timing differences 
between the various board meetings. 
 
Florida Affordable Housing Guarantee Program 
The Florida Affordable Housing Guarantee Program was created in 1992 to work in concert with 
federal, state, and local government financing sources to effectively lower the overall cost of 
borrowing capital for the construction and rehabilitation of affordable multifamily rental 
housing.
7
 These cost savings were achieved by the Guarantee Program guaranteeing the payment 
of mortgages that secure multifamily mortgage revenue bonds, thus raising the loan’s rating and 
reducing the overall cost of borrowing. In 2009, Florida Housing’s board of directors officially  
suspended the Guarantee Program due to continually low interest rates, which prompted 
developers to refinance properties outside of the Guarantee Program. Currently, just one 
multifamily rental property holds an outstanding guarantee from this program.
8
 
                                                
2
 Affordable Housing Work Group, Overview of the State’s Implementation of Rental Programs, (August 2017) available at 
https://www.floridahousing.org/docs/default-source/aboutflorida/august2017/august2017/tab7.pdf (last visited 
January 20, 2022). Chapter 2017-71, Laws of Fla., established the Workgroup to develop recommendations to address the 
state’s affordable housing needs. 
3
 Sections 420.509 and 420.51, F.S., and s. 16, Art. VII, State Constitution.  
4
 This section prescribes a statewide maximum bond interest rate, which is flexible with the bond market. The rate is 
computed by adding 300 basis points to The Bond Buyer “20 Bond Index” published immediately preceding the first day of 
the calendar month in which the bonds are sold. 
5
 Section 420.509(4), F.S. 
6
 Florida Housing Finance Corporation, SB 196 Talking Points, (November 11, 2021) on file with the Senate Appropriations 
Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development.  
7
 Section 420.5092, F.S. 
8
 Florida Housing Finance Corporation, 2020 Annual Report, p. 19, available at https://www.floridahousing.org/data-docs-
reports/annual-reports (last visited January 20, 2022).  BILL: SB 196   	Page 3 
 
III. Effect of Proposed Changes: 
Section 1 amends s. 420.509, F.S., to designate Florida Housing as the state fiscal agency to 
make the determination required by s. 16, Art. VII of the State Constitution, in connection with 
the issuance of Florida Housing bonds and removes the authority of the SBA to authorize an 
interest rate in excess of the maximum.  
 
The section also allows, where applicable, Florida Housing to use the interest rate limitation on 
bond issuance set forth in ss. 159.825 or 215.84, F.S., as applicable. This change allows Florida 
Housing to bear higher interest on taxable bonds without seeking SBA approval. 
 
Section 2 amends s. 420.5092, F.S., to remove the requirement for the Florida Housing 
Guarantee Program, now suspended, that the program’s fund’s financial rating remain consistent 
with rules adopted by the SBA. This is a technical change to conform to the bill’s removal of the 
SBA from oversight responsibility.  
 
Section 3 provides that the bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
IV. Constitutional Issues: 
A. Municipality/County Mandates Restrictions: 
None. 
B. Public Records/Open Meetings Issues: 
None. 
C. Trust Funds Restrictions: 
None. 
D. State Tax or Fee Increases: 
None. 
E. Other Constitutional Issues: 
None identified. 
V. Fiscal Impact Statement: 
A. Tax/Fee Issues: 
None. 
B. Private Sector Impact: 
None.  BILL: SB 196   	Page 4 
 
C. Government Sector Impact: 
According to Florida Housing, the current multi-layer review process can cause 
unpredictable delays and subject transactions to market volatility. This bill would 
ameliorate that concern and positively impact Florida Housing’s ability to reliably issue 
bonds.
9
 
VI. Technical Deficiencies: 
None. 
VII. Related Issues: 
None. 
VIII. Statutes Affected: 
This bill substantially amends sections 420.509 and 420.5092 of the Florida Statutes.   
IX. Additional Information: 
A. Committee Substitute – Statement of Changes: 
(Summarizing differences between the Committee Substitute and the prior version of the bill.) 
None. 
B. Amendments: 
None. 
This Senate Bill Analysis does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill’s introducer or the Florida Senate. 
                                                
9
 Florida Housing Finance Corporation, SB 196 Talking Points, (November 11, 2021) on file with the Senate Appropriations 
Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development.