LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0196
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0196
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0196
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
September 14, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 11, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
March 10, 2022
Analysis
March 2, 2022
Analysis
February 25, 2022
Analysis
February 4, 2022
Analysis
February 1, 2022
Analysis
November 3, 2021
Analysis
November 2, 2021
Comm Sub
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare