Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 09/21/2021 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 09/14/2021 | Filed |