|
05/06/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-90
|
|
|
|
05/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for HB 267
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 11/02/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2021
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|