Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 12/01/2021 | Now in Environment and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 09/15/2021 | Filed |