Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Education | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/01/2021 | Now in Education | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules | ||
Senate | 09/16/2021 | Filed |