Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 88, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 215
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|