LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0274
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0274
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0274
Action History
Senate
03/14/2022
Died in Regulated Industries
Senate
03/12/2022
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Senate
01/11/2022
Introduced
Senate
10/13/2021
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
Senate
09/21/2021
Filed