Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021