Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Filed |