Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Filed |