Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/03/2021 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 11/03/2021 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 10/25/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 09/23/2021 | Filed |