Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 09/23/2021 | Filed |