Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 3, 2021
Analysis November 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill November 3, 2021