Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0350 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis November 2, 2021
Analysis November 1, 2021