Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 8, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022