Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/02/2021 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 11/02/2021 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 10/25/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/02/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 09/28/2021 | Filed |