Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 235
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted HB 235
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|