Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/01/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/01/2021 | Filed |