Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/26/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2021
|
Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|