Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 10/21/2021 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/12/2021 | Filed |