|
05/06/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-92
|
|
|
|
05/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (268607)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 98, NAYS 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 268607 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Substituted for HB 489
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2021
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/02/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|