Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0438 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 12, 2022