Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021