|
06/06/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-164
|
|
|
|
06/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (568773)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 568773 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/21/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|