Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0474 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis December 1, 2021