Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 10/21/2021 | Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Rules | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Filed |