Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/06/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 10/21/2021 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/13/2021 | Filed |