House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (431710)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building --Not Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2021
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|