|
05/19/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-121
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|