|
03/16/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-15
|
|
|
|
03/15/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/14/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 86, NAYS 26
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 703
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (404840)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|