Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022