Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis December 1, 2021