House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Appropriations (734958); YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|