Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0546 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 30, 2021