Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 397
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 397
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/01/22, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|