Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 12, 2022