Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0562 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022