Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill December 2, 2021