Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 11/03/2021 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/22/2021 | Filed |