Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/06/2021 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 11/30/2021 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2021 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 11/03/2021 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 10/25/2021 | Filed |