House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Not Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Agriculture; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|